There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide jurisdiction and procedures for claims for compassionate payments for injuries due to exposure to radiation from nuclear testing.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-426.
10/15/1990Signed by President.
10/03/1990Presented to President.
09/27/1990Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
08/01/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/05/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
04/25/1990Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-463.
05/16/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (36)

Date Chamber
10/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-426.
10/15/1990Signed by President.
10/03/1990HousePresented to President.
10/03/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/27/1990-3:08pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
09/27/1990-3:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/1990-2:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/27/1990-2:27pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
09/27/1990-2:27pmHouseMr. James demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
09/27/1990-2:26pmHouseMr. Frank moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
08/03/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/01/1990SenateS.Amdt.2486 Amendment SP 2486 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
08/01/1990SenateAmendment SP 2486 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
08/01/1990SenateS.Amdt.2486 Proposed by Senator Hatfield for Senator Hatch. To provide for a substitute amendment.
08/01/1990SenateAmendment SP 2486 proposed by Senator Hatfield for Senator Hatch.
08/01/1990SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
06/08/1990SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 588.
06/07/1990SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/05/1990-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/1990-4:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/05/1990-3:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/05/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
06/05/1990-3:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
06/05/1990-3:27pmHouseMr. Frank moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/25/1990HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 282.
04/25/1990HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-463.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/28/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/28/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/07/1990HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
02/07/1990HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
11/08/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
11/01/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
05/19/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/16/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
05/16/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/16/1989 Referred to
03/28/1990 Markup by
04/25/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-463
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations05/19/1989 Referred to
11/08/1989 Hearings by
02/07/1990 Markup by
02/07/1990 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2372. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/01/1990)

Radiation Exposure Compensation Act - Establishes in the Treasury the Radiation Exposure Compensation Trust Fund for claims for injuries and death due to exposure during certain time periods to radiation from: (1) nuclear testing in Utah, Nevada, and Arizona; or (2) uranium mining in Colorado, New Mexico, Arizona, or Utah.

Terminates the Fund 22 years after the date of enactment of this Act.

Authorizes appropriations.

Sets forth a claims procedure for individuals who submit written medical documentation that they incurred specified diseases as a result of such exposure (including childhood leukemia). Establishes a 20-year limitation of actions period and restricts the amount of attorney's fees which may be received. Insulates the award of damages from insurance claims or payments.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to report on the incidence of radiation related to moderate or severe silicosis and pneumoconiosis in uranium miners employed in specified uranium mines located off Indian reservations.