There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Chemical and Biological Weapons Nonproliferation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the nonproliferation of chemical, biological, and toxin weapons.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/18/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/03/1989See H.R.3033.
05/26/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/26/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/18/1989Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/18/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 05/18/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/18/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/22/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/23/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/25/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/25/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/25/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/25/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/25/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/25/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/25/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/25/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/31/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/31/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/31/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/31/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/31/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/06/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/06/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/06/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/28/1989
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 06/28/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 06/28/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/16/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 10/16/1989
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/18/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/18/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science05/26/1989 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade05/26/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2426. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/18/1989)

Chemical and Biological Weapons Nonproliferation Act - Sets forth U.S. policy concerning chemical and biological weapons.

Requires the Secretary of Commerce to issue such regulations, licenses, and orders as may be required to control the export of materials, equipment, and technology having significance for the manufacture or use of chemical and biological weapons. Makes subject to the penalties imposed by the Export Administration Act of 1979 any person who violates any regulation, license, or order issued by the Secretary.

Requires the Secretary of State to assess the risk of the proliferation of chemical and biological weapons. Specifies particular matters to be considered by such assessment and requires such assessment to give particular attention to the materials, equipment, and technology that have direct significance for the production and use of chemical and biological weapons.

Requires the Secretary of State to submit to the Congress a biannual report describing the status of: (1) control of the proliferation of chemical and biological weapons; (2) efforts to prevent the spread of such weapons; and (3) programs to control the export of materials, equipment, and technology having direct significance for the production of chemical and biological weapons.

Requires the Secretary of State to establish a Chemical Industry Advisory Group to provide advice to the Secretary concerning such assessment and such biannual report.

Requires the Secretary of State to inform the appropriate committees of the Congress of developments of significance to the proliferation and control of chemical and biological weapons.