There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Recruitment Authority Act of 1989

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Recruitment Authority Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, with respect to veterans' readjustment appointments authorized by such title.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/31/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/19/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-164.
05/24/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/20/1989HouseSee H.R.901.
11/02/1989SenateCommittee on Veterans received executive comment from Department of Veterans Affairs.
08/11/1989SenateCommittee on Veterans requested executive comment from Department of Veterans Affairs, and Office of Personnel Management.
08/03/1989SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
07/31/1989-12:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/1989-12:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/31/1989-12:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/31/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
07/31/1989-12:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/31/1989-12:34pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/19/1989HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107.
07/19/1989HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-164.
07/13/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/13/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
07/12/1989HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
06/21/1989HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
06/21/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/24/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/24/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/24/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/19/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/19/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/19/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/19/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/19/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/19/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 07/19/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 07/19/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 07/19/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/19/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/19/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/19/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 07/19/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/19/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/19/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/19/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/19/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/19/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/19/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/24/1989 Referred to
07/13/1989 Markup by
07/19/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-164
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment06/21/1989 Referred to
06/21/1989 Hearings by
07/12/1989 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/03/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2486. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/31/1989)

Veterans Recruitment Authority Act of 1989 - Changes the name of the veterans' readjustment appointments program to the veterans recruitment authority (VRA) program. Removes the maximum GS-level (currently, GS-9) restriction for VRA appointments. Makes veterans who first became members of the armed forces after January 1, 1977, and who were discharged or released from active duty under conditions other than dishonorable eligible for VRA appointments. (Currently, such appointments are limited to certain qualified disabled veterans and Vietnam veterans.) Gives a preference for such appointments to veterans entitled to disability compensation or discharged or released from active duty for a disability incurred or aggravated in the line of duty. Provides training for any veteran receiving a VRA appointment, and upon completion of a probationary period, the acquisition of a competitive status. (Current law requires such appointees to be on the job for two years before such status is awarded.)

Provides eligibility for a VRA appointment, in the case of non-disabled post-Vietnam era veterans, for five years after the enactment of this Act or the date of discharge, whichever is later. Eliminates any eligibility termination for service-connected disabled veterans and veterans who served on active duty in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign badge has been authorized.

Repeals the December 31, 1989, termination date for the VRA program.