Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/13/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/13/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/13/1989
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/13/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/13/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 06/13/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 06/13/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 06/13/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/13/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/13/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/13/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/13/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/20/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/20/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/20/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/20/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/20/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/20/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/20/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/20/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/28/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/28/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/28/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 07/12/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/12/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 07/25/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/25/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/25/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/25/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/25/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/25/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/03/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/03/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/03/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/03/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 08/03/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 08/03/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/03/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 08/03/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/12/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 09/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 09/20/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/20/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/20/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/20/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/20/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/20/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/02/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/02/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 10/02/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/02/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/02/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 10/17/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/17/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/17/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 10/17/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/25/1989
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/02/1989
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 11/02/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/08/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 11/08/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/27/1990