There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

White House Conference on Homelessness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a White House Conference on Homelessness.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/15/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
06/06/1989Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/13/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/13/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/13/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/13/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/13/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/13/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/13/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/13/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/13/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/13/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/13/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/13/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/20/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 06/20/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/20/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/20/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/20/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/20/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/20/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/20/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/20/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/20/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/20/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/20/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/20/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/20/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/20/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/13/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/13/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/13/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/13/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/13/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/13/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/13/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/13/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/13/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/13/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 07/24/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/24/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs06/06/1989 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development06/15/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2560.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2560. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/1989)

White House Conference on Homelessness Act - Directs the President to call a National White House Conference on Homelessness. Provides for State and regional conferences. Requires a report to the President and to the Congress.

Authorizes appropriations.