Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/06/1989
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 08/03/1989
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/19/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/19/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/13/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/06/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 03/06/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/03/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/18/1990