Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 06/08/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/21/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 06/22/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/27/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/28/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/29/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/29/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/29/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/11/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/13/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/18/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/18/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/18/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/18/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/18/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/18/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/1989
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 07/21/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/25/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 07/25/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/25/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/26/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/27/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/31/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/01/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 09/07/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 09/07/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/07/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/07/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/07/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/07/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 09/07/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/07/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/07/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/07/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/07/1989
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 09/07/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/12/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/12/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/25/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/25/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/25/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/26/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/27/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 09/27/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/27/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/18/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/18/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/31/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/31/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 11/01/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 11/02/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 11/02/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 11/07/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/07/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 11/07/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/07/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/07/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/07/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/13/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/15/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 11/16/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/16/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 11/17/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/20/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/21/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 11/21/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 11/21/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/21/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/21/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 11/21/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 11/21/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/24/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/24/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/24/1990
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 01/24/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 01/24/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 01/24/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/24/1990
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/24/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 01/24/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 01/24/1990
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/31/1990
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 01/31/1990
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 01/31/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 01/31/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/07/1990
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/07/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/07/1990
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/07/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/22/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/22/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/22/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/22/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/22/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/22/1990
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/22/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/22/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/07/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/07/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/07/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/07/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/07/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/07/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 03/14/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 03/14/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/20/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/20/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/20/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/20/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/20/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/20/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/20/1990
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 03/20/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/20/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/20/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/20/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/20/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/20/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/20/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/20/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/20/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/28/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/28/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 03/28/1990
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/28/1990
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/28/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/28/1990
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/28/1990
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/04/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/04/1990
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/04/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/04/1990
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 04/04/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/19/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/24/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/01/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/01/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/08/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/17/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/07/1990
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 06/07/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/10/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew