There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To name the Department of Veterans Affairs outpatient clinic located at 1900 Mason Avenue, Daytona Beach, Florida, as the "William V. Chappell, Jr., Veterans' Outpatient Clinic".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/02/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/26/1989Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-256.
06/08/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/03/1989SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
10/02/1989-1:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/02/1989-1:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/02/1989-12:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/02/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
10/02/1989-12:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/02/1989-12:54pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/26/1989HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 57.
09/26/1989HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-256.
09/20/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/20/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported.
06/08/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/08/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 06/08/1989
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 06/08/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/26/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/26/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/26/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/26/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 09/26/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/26/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 09/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/26/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 09/26/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/26/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 09/26/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/26/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/26/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/26/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/08/1989 Referred to
09/20/1989 Markup by
09/26/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-256
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/03/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2594.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2594. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1989)

Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs outpatient clinic located at 1900 Mason Avenue, Daytona Beach, Florida, as the William V. Chappell, Jr., Veterans' Outpatient Clinic.