There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the transfer of certain animals, commonly known as the Silver Spring Monkeys, to any of certain entities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/07/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/08/1989Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 06/08/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/19/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 06/19/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/19/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/19/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/19/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/19/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 06/19/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/19/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 06/21/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/21/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/23/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/23/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/23/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/23/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/29/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/29/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/29/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/29/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/29/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/29/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/29/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/10/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/10/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 07/10/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/10/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/17/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/17/1989
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/17/1989
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/31/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/31/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/31/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/31/1989
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/18/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 09/18/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/18/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/18/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/18/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/18/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/18/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/18/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/18/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/18/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/18/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/18/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/18/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/18/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/18/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/18/1989
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/04/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/04/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/04/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/04/1989
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 10/04/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/04/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/04/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/13/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/13/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/13/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/13/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 10/13/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/13/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 10/25/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/25/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/25/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/25/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/25/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 11/08/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 11/08/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 11/08/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/08/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/23/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/23/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/24/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/24/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/07/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/20/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/03/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/17/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/17/1990
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 06/20/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/30/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/05/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/08/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/07/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2596.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1989)

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to enter into an agreement for the transfer of specified monkeys used in research at the Institute for Behavioral Research in Silver Spring, Maryland, to Primarily Primates, Inc., an animal sanctuary in San Antonio, Texas, the teaching zoo known as Moorpark College in Moorpark, California, or the San Diego Zoo in San Diego, California.