Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 06/14/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/04/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/04/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/04/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/04/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/13/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/13/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 09/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/07/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/15/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/24/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/31/1990