Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/22/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/22/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/13/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/13/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/13/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/13/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/13/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/13/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/13/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/13/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/13/1989
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/13/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/13/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/04/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/04/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/04/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/04/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 08/04/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 08/04/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/11/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 10/11/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/11/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/11/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/11/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 01/23/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 01/30/1990