There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 311 of the Older Americans Act of 1965 to require the Secretary of Agriculture to provide assistance for 2 meals served daily per person.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/12/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
06/27/1989Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/17/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/17/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 07/17/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/17/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/17/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/17/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/17/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/17/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/19/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/19/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 07/19/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/19/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/19/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/19/1989
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 07/20/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/20/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/20/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/20/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/24/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/24/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/24/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/24/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/24/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/26/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/26/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/26/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/26/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/02/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/02/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/04/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/07/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 09/07/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/07/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/07/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/07/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/28/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/03/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/25/1989

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor06/27/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources07/12/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2756.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2756. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/27/1989)

Amends the Older Americans Act of 1965 with regard to surplus commodity food assistance for older persons to require that assistance be provided for two meals served daily per person if such meals have a specified nutritional content.