Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 06/28/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 06/28/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 06/28/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 06/28/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/07/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/07/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/07/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 02/07/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/07/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/07/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/07/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/07/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/07/1990
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/07/1990
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/07/1990
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/07/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/07/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/07/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/07/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/07/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/07/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/07/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/07/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/07/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 02/07/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/07/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/07/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/07/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/24/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/24/1990
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 09/13/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/19/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/19/1990