There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Police Corps Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Police Corps Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/02/1989Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
07/20/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/29/1989Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/18/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 10/18/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/18/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 10/18/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 10/18/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/18/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/18/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/18/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/18/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/18/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/18/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/18/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 10/18/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/18/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/18/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/18/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/31/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/31/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 10/31/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/31/1989
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/31/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/31/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 10/31/1989
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 10/31/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/15/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/15/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 11/21/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/28/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/28/1990
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/28/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 04/18/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/18/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/18/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/23/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/23/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/23/1990
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/23/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/23/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/23/1990
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/30/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 07/30/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/03/1990
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/03/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 08/03/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 08/03/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 08/03/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 08/03/1990
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 08/03/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 08/03/1990 09/17/1990 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/29/1989 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime07/20/1989 Referred to
11/02/1989 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2798. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/1989)

Police Corps Act - Establishes an Office of the Police Corps within the Justice Department to be headed by a Director appointed by the President and subject to Senate confirmation.

Authorizes the Director of the Office of the Police Corps to agree to repay the educational loans of State Police Corps program participants and reimburse them for educational expenses of up to $40,000 following their completion of: (1) an educational course of study; (2) Federal training; and (3) four years of State or local police force service. Limits participants in such programs to 25,000 people per year. Declares that the Director's obligation to pay a participant's educational expenses shall be void and the Director shall be entitled to recover from the participant the amount of any interest on an educational loan that the Director has paid if the participant fails to complete the educational study, Federal training, and required service unless the failure is the result of death or permanent disability. Provides that a dependent child of a law enforcement officer who is not a program participant and who is killed in the line of duty shall be entitled to the educational assistance authorized in this Act without incurring any service obligation.

Sets forth selection criteria of and qualifications for participants for State Police Corps programs. Requires each State participating in the Police Corps to make special efforts to seek and recruit minorities without relaxing admission standards.

Requires the Director to establish up to three training centers to provide basic law enforcement training to State Police Corps program participants. Requires participants to attend two eight-week training sessions at such training centers and to meet certain performance standards in order to remain in the Police Corps program. Requires the Director to pay participants a weekly stipend during training. Establishes a nine-member Board of Directors, appointed by the President and subject to Senate confirmation, to administer such training centers. Requires the Director to serve as chairman of the Board.

Requires a State, in order to participate in the Police Corps program, to submit a plan for implementing such program to the Director for approval. Requires such plan to: (1) include assurances that participants will receive additional State or local training after completing Federal training which shall count toward the four-year service obligation; and (2) provide that program participants shall be assigned to community and preventive patrol in geographic areas with the greatest need for additional law enforcement personnel. Provides for the swearing in of participants as members of the police force to which they are assigned after completing Federal training and meeting the requirements of that police force.

Requires the Director to report to the President and the Congress not later than April 1 of each year.

Authorizes appropriations.