There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 14, United States Code, to permit recordings of military bands to be sold commercially.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/28/1990Reported to House (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept.99-769, Part I.
06/29/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
11/05/1990See H.R.4739.
09/28/1990Reported to House (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept.99-769, Part I.
09/13/1990Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/13/1990Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
07/30/1990Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation
07/30/1990Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation
07/11/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation
07/10/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/10/1989Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
07/07/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
07/07/1989Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
06/29/1989Referred jointly to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1989Referred jointly to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/29/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/29/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/11/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 07/11/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/11/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/11/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/11/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/19/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/19/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/19/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/19/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/19/1989
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/12/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/12/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/12/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/12/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/06/1990
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/01/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/1990
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/01/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/19/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/19/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/19/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/19/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/19/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/29/1989 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness07/10/1989 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/29/1989 Referred to
09/13/1990 Markup by
09/28/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-769 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Navigation07/07/1989 Referred to
07/11/1990 Hearings by
07/30/1990 Markup by
07/30/1990 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2800. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (09/28/1990)

Authorizes the Coast Guard band or any Army, Navy, Marine Corps or Air Force band designated as a special band to produce recordings for commercial sale. Allows proceeds to be credited to the appropriations of the Departments of the Army, Navy, Air Force, and the Coast Guard for the expenses of such bands. Directs the Secretaries of the Army, Navy, Air Force, and Transportation to prescribe regulations governing the accounting of such proceeds.