There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38 of the United States Code to permit certain eligible veterans to purchase up to $20,000 of National Service Life Insurance.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/27/1989Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance
09/27/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/29/1989Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 01/31/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 01/31/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/31/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/20/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/22/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/29/1989 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance09/27/1989 Referred to
09/27/1989 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2826.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2826. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/1989)

Permits an eligible veteran to purchase additional National Service Life Insurance in an amount equal to the amount of National Service Life Insurance such veteran already has in force.