Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/03/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/03/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/03/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 10/03/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/12/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/12/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/12/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/12/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/24/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 11/19/1989
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/19/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/06/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/06/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/06/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/06/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/27/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/27/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/27/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/27/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/25/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/27/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/27/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/27/1990
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/27/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/27/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/27/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/27/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/27/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/27/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/27/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/27/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/27/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 06/27/1990
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/27/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/27/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 06/27/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 06/27/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/19/1990