Summary: H.R.2848 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.2848. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/1989)

Computer Matching and Privacy Protection Act Amendments of 1989 - Amends the Computer Matching and Privacy Protection Act of 1988 to delay until January 1, 1990, the effective date of such Act with respect to existing agency matching programs: (1) which are identified by an agency as being in operation before June 1, 1989; (2) whose identification is submitted by the agency to specified congressional committees and the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) before August 1, 1989, in a report containing a schedule for compliance with the Act; and (3) whose identification is published by OMB in the Federal Register before September 15, 1989.