There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Consolidated Maternal and Child Health Services Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a program of block grants to the States for the purpose of consolidating Federal programs with respect to maternal and child health.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/12/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
08/24/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/31/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/18/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/17/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/12/1989Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/1989Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/1989Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/1989Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/12/1989 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/18/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/12/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/31/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor07/12/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education08/24/1989 Referred to
House Agriculture07/12/1989 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition07/17/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2881.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/12/1989)

Consolidated Maternal and Child Health Services Act of 1989 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services, for each fiscal year, to make an allotment for, and payments to, each State for maternal and child health care and related services, including: (1) for women, providing health services related to pregnancy; (2) for infants and children, providing preventive health services; (3) for infants not exceeding one year of age, providing comprehensive health services; (4) training individuals in administering such services for women, infants, and children; (5) conducting evaluations of such services; and (6) conducting surveys or studies required by the Secretary under this Act.

Requires that the services for women, except for inpatient services, be provided at a single facility in the community. Imposes the same requirement on the services for infants and children.

Authorizes States to expend the payments to make grants to public and nonprofit entities and to enter into contracts with public and private entities.

Declares that, notwithstanding any other law, if an individual is eligible for any service or item under these provisions, the individual may not receive the service or item under specified provisions of: (1) titles V (Maternal and Child Health Services), XIX (Medicaid), and XX (Grants to States for Social Services) of the Social Security Act; (2) the Public Health Service Act; (3) the Child Nutrition Act of 1966; (4) the Agriculture and Consumer Protection Act of 1973; and (5) any other Federal program providing services or items with respect to maternal or child health. Excludes from the consolidation those programs: (1) involving nutrition services through school facilities or child-care facilities; or (2) providing cash assistance to beneficiaries, including under titles IV (Child Welfare Programs) and XVI (Supplemental Security Income) of the Social Security Act.

Repeals titles X (Population Research and Voluntary Family Planning Programs) and XX (Adolescent Family Life Demonstration Projects) of the Public Health Service Act.

Requires the head of the agency that administers each program consolidated by this Act to make a determination regarding any amendments which should be made to any Act affecting that program and report to the appropriate committees of the Congress.

Prohibits payments to a State unless the State agrees that the payments will not be expended to pay for any abortion, or for any counseling on or referral for obtaining any abortion, except where the life of the mother would be endangered if the fetus were carried to term.

Limits administrative expenditures to ten percent of the payments. Sets forth reporting and auditing requirements.

Prohibits payments to a State unless the State agrees that the State will: (1) provide services without regard to the ability of an individual to pay; (2) make charges, if any, pursuant to a public schedule of charges; (3) conduct surveys and studies as required by the Secretary and submit findings to the Secretary; (4) establish criteria to evaluate the performance of entities that receive funds from payments made to the State; (5) establish procedures for procedural and substantive independent State review of the failure by the State to provide funds for any such entity; (6) permit and cooperate with Federal investigations under provisions of this Act; and (7) maintain State expenditures for services or items provided for in this Act at a level not less than that maintained in the previous fiscal year.

Sets forth a formula for determining the amount of the allotments to States.

Directs the Secretary, for FY 1991, to make a supplemental allotment for each State that has made satisfactory progress toward: (1) providing all State-assisted maternal and child health services and items without regard to whether the services and items are provided with Federal financial assistance; and (2) providing the services and items pursuant to a single, standardized application form through which all desired services and items can be simultaneously requested. Sets forth: (1) a formula for determining the amount of the supplemental allotments; and (2) special provisions applicable to Indian tribes or tribal organizations.

Authorizes appropriations. Requires any amounts paid to a State to remain available to the State for one year after the State receives the amounts.