Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 07/19/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/25/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/25/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/25/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/25/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/25/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/25/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/25/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/25/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/25/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/25/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 07/25/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/25/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/25/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/25/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/25/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/25/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/25/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/25/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/27/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/27/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 07/27/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/27/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/27/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/27/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/27/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/27/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/27/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/27/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/27/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/27/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/27/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/04/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/04/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 08/04/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 08/04/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/04/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 08/04/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/04/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 08/04/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/04/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 08/04/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 08/04/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/04/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/04/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 08/04/1989
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 08/04/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 08/04/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/12/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/12/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/12/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/12/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/12/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/12/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/12/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/12/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/12/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/21/1989
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/21/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/21/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/04/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 10/04/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/04/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/04/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/04/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/04/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 10/04/1989
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 10/04/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/04/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/19/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/19/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/19/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/19/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/19/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/19/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 10/19/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/19/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/19/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/19/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/01/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/01/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 11/01/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/01/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 11/01/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/01/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 11/01/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/01/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/01/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/17/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 11/17/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 11/17/1989
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/30/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 01/30/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/30/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/30/1990
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 01/30/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/30/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/30/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/30/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/26/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/26/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/26/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/12/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/12/1990
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/18/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/18/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/18/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/10/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/10/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/10/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/10/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/10/1990
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/10/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/10/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/10/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/10/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/10/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/10/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 07/13/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/13/1990
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 07/13/1990
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/13/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/13/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 07/13/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/13/1990
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 07/25/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/30/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/30/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/01/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 08/01/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 08/01/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/03/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/10/1990
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/10/1990
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/10/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/10/1990