Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/20/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/02/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 08/02/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/02/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/02/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/02/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 08/02/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/02/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/02/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/02/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/02/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/02/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/02/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/02/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/06/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/06/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/06/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/21/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/21/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/21/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/21/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/05/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/05/1989
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/19/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/20/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/20/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/20/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 11/20/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/20/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/20/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/21/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/21/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/21/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/21/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/21/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/21/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/21/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 11/21/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 01/23/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/23/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 01/23/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/23/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 01/23/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 01/23/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/01/1990
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/01/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/06/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/06/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/06/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/03/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/19/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/19/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/19/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/19/1990
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/19/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/19/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/19/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/30/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/30/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/02/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/02/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/08/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/08/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 05/08/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/17/1990
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/17/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/22/1990