Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/26/1989
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 09/26/1989
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/1989
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/26/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 09/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/26/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/26/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/26/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/26/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 09/26/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/26/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/26/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/26/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/26/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/26/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/26/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/26/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/26/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/26/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/26/1989
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/26/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/26/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/26/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 09/26/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/26/1989
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/26/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/26/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 09/26/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/26/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/26/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 09/26/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 09/26/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/26/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/23/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/23/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/23/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/23/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/23/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/23/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 11/09/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/09/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/09/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/28/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/28/1990
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/28/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 03/28/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/28/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/28/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/28/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 03/28/1990
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/28/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 03/28/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/28/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/28/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/28/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/28/1990
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/28/1990
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/25/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/1990
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/25/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/25/1990
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/1990
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/27/1990