Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 01/03/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/23/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/23/1989
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/23/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/23/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 02/23/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/23/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/23/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/23/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/23/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/23/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/23/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/23/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/23/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/23/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/23/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 02/23/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 02/23/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/23/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/23/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/23/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 02/23/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/23/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/23/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/23/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/23/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 02/23/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/01/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/01/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/01/1989
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/12/1989
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/12/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/12/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/12/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 04/12/1989
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 04/12/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/12/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/12/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/12/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/12/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/12/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/12/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/12/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/12/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/12/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/12/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/12/1989
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/12/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/09/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/09/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/09/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/09/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/09/1989
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/09/1989
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/09/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/23/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/23/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/23/1989
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/20/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/25/1989