Refine your search

10 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
11/16/1990 Became Public Law No: 101-592.
11/16/1990 Signed by President.
11/09/1990 Presented to President.
10/26/1990 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
10/26/1990 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
07/23/1990 Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Hollings with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-388.
09/19/1989 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/12/1989 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 101-211, Part II.
08/02/1989 Reported by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 101-211, Part I.
07/25/1989 Introduced in House