Committees: H.R.3000 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/25/1989 Referred to
08/01/1989 Markup by
09/12/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-211 Part 2
House Science, Space and Technology07/25/1989 Referred to
07/26/1989 Markup by
08/02/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-211 Part 1
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation09/20/1989 Referred to
11/20/1989 Hearings by
05/22/1990 Markup by
07/23/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-388 Part 1