There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Industrial Design Anti-Piracy Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the copyright law, title 17 of the United States Code, to provide for protection of industrial designs of useful articles.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/26/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/27/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice
06/20/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice
05/03/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice
07/31/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/26/1989Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/26/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 07/26/1989
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 08/03/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 08/03/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 08/03/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 08/03/1989
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 08/03/1989
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 08/03/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/03/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/04/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/04/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 09/12/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/12/1989
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 09/12/1989
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/12/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/12/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/12/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/03/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/03/1989
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/03/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/03/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/16/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/16/1989
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 11/20/1989
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 11/20/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/20/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 11/20/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/13/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/13/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/13/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/13/1990
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/03/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/26/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 08/03/1989 10/19/1989 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/26/1989 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice07/31/1989 Referred to
09/27/1990 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3017.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3017. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/26/1989)

Industrial Design Anti-Piracy Act of 1989 - Amends the copyright law to provide for the protection of industrial designs of useful articles (including typefonts), except designs that are: (1) not original; (2) staple or commonplace; (3) different from commonplace or staple designs in insignificant ways; (4) determined solely by a utilitarian function; (5) composed of three-dimensional features of shape and surface in wearing apparel; (6) a semiconductor chip product already protected under another provision; or (7) embodying a process or idea or system. States that protection for a design shall be available for subject matter usually excluded if the design is a substantial revision, adaptation, or rearrangement of such subject matter.

Sets the term of protection at ten years.

Requires the design to be marked with a design notice when it is made public. States that omission of such notice shall not cause loss of protection or prevent recovery for infringement against any person who receives written notice of the protection.

Specifies the criteria for determination of infringement of a protected design.

Provides that protection of a design shall be lost if application for registration is not made within one year after the date on which the design is first made public. Provides procedures for application for the protection of a design through a certificate of registration. Sets a fee schedule for such process.

Specifies the ownership and transfer rights of designs subject to protection.

Provides remedies for infringement of a registered design, including injunctive relief and damages. Allows judicial review of a final refusal of the Register of the Copyright Office to register a design.

Prescribes penalties for fraudulent registration, false marking, and false representation of any design.

Provides that this Act shall take effect one year after the date of enactment. States that no design made public prior to the effective date shall be protected.