There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Agricultural Research Service, U.S. Department of Agriculture, animal health research building in Clay Center, Nebraska, as the "Virginia D. Smith Animal Health Research Laboratory".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/10/1990Became Public Law No: 101-353.
08/10/1990Signed by President.
08/09/1990Presented to President.
08/04/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/04/1990Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/28/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/10/1990Became Public Law No: 101-353.
08/10/1990Signed by President.
08/09/1990HousePresented to President.
08/09/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
08/04/1990SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/04/1990SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/03/1990SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
05/01/1990-5:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/01/1990-5:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/01/1990-5:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/01/1990HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
05/01/1990-5:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
05/01/1990-5:32pmHouseMr. de la Garza moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/19/1990HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/19/1990HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/01/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/01/1989HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
07/28/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
07/28/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 07/28/1989
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 07/28/1989
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 03/15/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/28/1989 Referred to
04/19/1990 Markup by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition08/01/1989 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works05/03/1990 Referred to
08/04/1990 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3048.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3048. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/1989)

Designates the Agricultural Research Service, Department of Agriculture, animal health research building located at the Roman L. Hruska United States Meat Animal Research Center in Clay Center, Nebraska, as the Virginia D. Smith Animal Health Research Laboratory.