Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/04/1989
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/04/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/04/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/24/1990
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 02/20/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 02/20/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/14/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/14/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/14/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/27/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/27/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/27/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/04/1990
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 05/02/1990
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/1990
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/02/1990
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/02/1990
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/02/1990
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/02/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/02/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/05/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/05/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/05/1990
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/05/1990
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 06/05/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/05/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/31/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/31/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/31/1990