Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 08/04/1989
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/06/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/06/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/06/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 09/06/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/06/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/19/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/19/1989
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/19/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/19/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/19/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/19/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/25/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/25/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/25/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 11/20/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/20/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/20/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/20/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 02/06/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/06/1990