There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Health Professionals Educational Amendments of 1989

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Health Professionals Educational Amendments of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Health Professionals Educational Amendments of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to establish a program to provide post-secondary educational assistance to students in health professions who are eligible for educational assistance under the Reserve GI Bill program in return for agreement for subsequent service with the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/30/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/26/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-312.
08/04/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
08/15/1990HouseProvisions Included In H.R.1199 (Section 205).
05/01/1990SenateReferred to the Committee on Veterans by unanimous consent.
11/03/1989SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.
10/31/1989SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/30/1989-12:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1989-12:20pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1989-12:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/30/1989-12:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/30/1989-12:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/30/1989-12:09pmHouseOn ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1989-12:08pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
10/30/1989-12:08pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/26/1989HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 197.
10/26/1989HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-312.
10/18/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/18/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
10/12/1989HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
10/12/1989HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
10/12/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/12/1989HouseHearing Held by the Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment Prior to Referral (Sep 21, 89).
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
08/04/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
08/04/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 08/04/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 10/12/1989
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 10/12/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/12/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 10/12/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/12/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/12/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/12/1989
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/12/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 10/12/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/12/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/12/1989
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 10/18/1989
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 10/18/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/18/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/18/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/18/1989
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/18/1989
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 10/18/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/25/1989
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/25/1989
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/25/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/25/1989
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/25/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 10/25/1989
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/25/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 10/25/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/25/1989
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/25/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 10/25/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/25/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 10/25/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/25/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/25/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/25/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/25/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/25/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 10/25/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/25/1989
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/25/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/25/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs08/04/1989 Referred to
10/18/1989 Markup by
10/26/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-312
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment10/12/1989 Referred to
10/12/1989 Hearings by
10/12/1989 Markup by
10/12/1989 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/01/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3199.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/30/1989)

Veterans Health Professionals Educational Amendments of 1989 - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to institute a Selected Reserve member stipend program under the Armed Forces Educational Assistance Program. Requires an individual, in order to be eligible for such assistance, to be accepted or enrolled as a full-time student at a qualifying educational institution in a course of education or training approved by the Secretary and that leads toward completion of a degree in a health profession involving direct patient care or care incident to such direct patient care.

Prohibits the Secretary from approving the application of an individual applying for such assistance unless the individual is entitled to benefits under the Selected Reserve GI Bill program and the individual achieved a certain qualifying score on the Armed Forces Qualification Test.

Authorizes the Secretary to pay a qualifying individual $400 monthly under such program. Requires a period of obligated service as a full-time employee of the Department of Veterans Affairs from a participating individual in return for such assistance. Makes such an individual liable to the United States for failure to serve in the Department at a health-care facility for the agreed upon period.

Increases the Selected Reserve member stipend amount whenever there is a general Federal pay increase.