There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement the steel trade liberalization program.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/12/1989Became Public Law No: 101-221.
12/12/1989Signed by President.
12/01/1989Presented to President.
11/22/1989Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion to agree to Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
11/22/1989Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/15/1989Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Bentsen with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-206.
10/02/1989Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 354 - 10 (Roll No. 258).
09/27/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-263.
09/14/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (37)

Date Chamber
12/12/1989Became Public Law No: 101-221.
12/12/1989Signed by President.
12/01/1989HousePresented to President.
12/01/1989SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/22/1989SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1989-4:29amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/22/1989-4:29amHouseOn motion to agree to Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
11/22/1989-4:28amHouseMr. Rostenkowski asked unanimous consent that the House agree to Senate amendment.
11/22/1989SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/22/1989SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
11/22/1989SenateAmendment SP 1218 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/22/1989SenateS.Amdt.1218 Amendment SP 1218 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/22/1989SenateS.Amdt.1218 Proposed by Senator Bentsen. To provide for duty-free importation of certain types of ethanol from beneficiary countries of the Caribbean Basin Economic Recovery Act, and for other purposes.
11/22/1989SenateAmendment SP 1218 proposed by Senator Bentsen.
11/22/1989SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
11/15/1989SenateCommittee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Finance
11/15/1989SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
11/15/1989SenateCommittee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Bentsen with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-206.
Action By: Committee on Finance
10/27/1989SenateSubcommittee on International Trade. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-645.
Action By: Senate Finance Subcommittee on International Trade
10/03/1989SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
10/02/1989-4:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/02/1989-4:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 354 - 10 (Roll No. 258).
10/02/1989-4:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
10/02/1989-2:13pmHouseYeas and Nays were ordered. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed.
10/02/1989-1:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/02/1989HouseThe chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
10/02/1989-1:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/02/1989-1:40pmHouseMr. Pease moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/27/1989HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
09/27/1989HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-263.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/27/1989HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/27/1989HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/19/1989HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade
09/19/1989HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade
09/15/1989HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/14/1989HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
09/14/1989HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/14/1989 Referred to
09/27/1989 Markup by
09/27/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-263
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade09/15/1989 Referred to
09/19/1989 Markup by
09/19/1989 Reported by
Senate Finance10/03/1989 Referred to
11/15/1989 Markup by
11/15/1989 Reported by S.Rept 101-206
Senate Finance Subcommittee on International Trade10/27/1989 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/22/1989)

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Implementation Act - Amends the Steel Import Stabilization Act to declare that the Congress supports the implementation of the steel trade liberalization program.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the United States Trade Representative should conduct negotiations, through the Uruguay Round of negotiations under the General Agreement on Tariffs and Trade and through complementary bilateral arrangements, to seek an international consensus regarding steel trade that provides for: (1) disciplines over trade-distorting government subsidies; (2) the lowering of trade barriers to ensure market access; and (3) enforcement measures to deal with violations of consensus obligations. Requires the President to provide the Congress an annual assessment of progress of such negotiations.

Extends the Steel Import Stabilization Act for a three-year period. Authorizes the President, between October 1, 1989, and the concluding of any bilateral steel arrangement, to take necessary actions to ensure an orderly transition to such arrangement. Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to permit the importation of additional quantities of steel products without regard to any aggregate quantitative import limitation arrangement in effect if: (1) such bilateral arrangement includes a short supply provision; and (2) the Secretary determines that a short supply situation exists in the United States with respect to any steel product subject to such arrangement.

Authorizes the filing of petitions requesting the Secretary to determine whether a short supply situation exists. Requires the Secretary to provide an opportunity for comment by interested persons regarding issues raised in such petitions. Directs the Secretary to publish such determinations in the Federal Register.

Requires the International Trade Commission to seek information: (1) from purchasers, as well as domestic producers, of steel products regarding improvements in domestic quality and service that result from industry modernization; and (2) on worker retraining efforts of the steel industry.

Amends the Tax Reform Act of 1986 to treat certain ethyl alcohols produced in an insular possession or beneficiary country as indigenous products of such possession or country if certain requirements are met.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code with respect to environmental taxes on petroleum to revise the financing rate for the Hazardous Substance Superfund.