Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 09/28/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/05/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 10/11/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/12/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/12/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 10/25/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/25/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/08/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/08/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 01/25/1990