Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/02/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/02/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/02/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/02/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/02/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 10/02/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/02/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/02/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/02/1989
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/02/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/02/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/02/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/02/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/02/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/02/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/02/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/02/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/02/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/02/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/1989
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/02/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/02/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/02/1989
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/02/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/02/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/02/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/02/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/02/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/02/1989
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 10/02/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/03/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/03/1989
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/03/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/03/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/03/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/03/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/03/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/03/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/03/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/03/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/03/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/03/1989
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/03/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/03/1989
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/03/1989
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 10/03/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/03/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/03/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 10/03/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/03/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/03/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 10/03/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/03/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/03/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/03/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/03/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 10/03/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/03/1989
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 10/03/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 10/03/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/03/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/03/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/04/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/04/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/04/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/04/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/10/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/10/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/10/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/10/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 10/11/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/11/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/11/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/11/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/11/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/11/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/11/1989
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/11/1989