There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Global Environment Research and Policy Act of 1989

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Environment Research and Policy Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for development of a National Global Change Research Plan to coordinate oceanographic, atmospheric, terrestrial, and polar research programs; to direct the Council on Environmental Quality to advise the President on policies relating to global change; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/15/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 101-394, Part I.
09/25/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
12/15/1989Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 101-394, Part I.
11/20/1989Mr. Studds asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries have until 12:00 p.m. on Dec. 15 to file a report on H.R. 3332. Agreed to without objection.
11/16/1989Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment
11/16/1989Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research, and Environment Approved for Full Committee Consideration an Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute Consisting of the Text of H.R. 2984
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment
10/30/1989Favorable Executive Comment Received from NSF.
09/26/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research, and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
09/26/1989Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, EPA, and CEQ.
09/26/1989Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
09/26/1989Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
09/25/1989Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/1989Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 09/25/1989

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space and Technology09/25/1989 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agriculture Research and Environment09/26/1989 Referred to
11/16/1989 Markup by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries09/25/1989 Referred to
09/26/1989 Markup by
12/15/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-394 Part 1

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3332. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/15/1989)

Global Environment Research and Policy Act of 1989 - Title I: National Global Change Research Plan - Establishes a Committee on Earth Sciences within the Executive Office of the President.

Directs the Committee to develop a National Global Change Research Plan for a ten-year national research program on the processes and factors which contribute to global change, including research on increases of global sea levels. Requires that such Plan allocate research responsibilities among Federal agencies. Requires that such Plan be submitted to the Congress within one year of this Act's enactment and reviewed and revised, as necessary, at least once every three years. Directs the Committee to: (1) oversee implementation of the Plan; (2) coordinate global change research and assessment activities among Federal agencies; (3) work with the National Research Council and other groups conducting such activities; (4) promote consistent, efficient, and compatible transfer and use of research data; and (5) cooperate with the Secretary of State in providing U.S. representation at international governmental meetings on global change.

Requires each Federal agency to submit a report identifying each element of its proposed global change activities to the President and the Committee when it submits its appropriations request to the President. Directs the President to give the Council an opportunity to review and comment on the budget estimate for each agency in the context of the Plan before submitting the annual budget to the Congress, and identify in such budget the portion of each agency's annual budget that is allocated to each element of that agency's global change activities.

Sets forth Committee reporting requirements.

Title II: Global Change Policy - Requires the Council on Environmental Quality to advise the President on domestic and international policies, plans, and programs of the Federal Government related to global change. Sets forth reporting requirements, including the requirement that the Council develop and submit to the Congress and the President, within five years of this Act's enactment, a comprehensive program to abate, mitigate, and adapt to the impacts of global change. Requires that such program be updated periodically to incorporate the results of Plan research.

Title III: Miscellaneous - Directs the Council to issue regulations to require Federal agencies to ensure: (1) the consideration of the significant effects of major actions on the environment of the global commons outside the jurisdiction of any nation; and (2) the formal assessment of such actions on the environment outside of U.S. jurisdiction.

Authorizes appropriations to the Council for FY 1990 and 1991.

Title IV: International Programs in Global Change Research - Directs the Secretary of State to initiate discussions with other nations leading toward: (1) an international protocol in global change research and assessment; and (2) an international research protocol for environmentally safe energy technologies.