Committees: H.R.3386 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation10/02/1989 Referred to
11/17/1989 Markup by
12/01/1989 Reported by H.Rept 101-390 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation10/16/1989 Referred to
10/16/1989 Hearings by
11/17/1989 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce12/01/1989 Referred to
03/13/1990 Markup by
03/15/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-390 Part 2
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/28/1990 Referred to
09/20/1990 Discharged from