Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 10/06/1989
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/10/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/11/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/11/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/11/1989
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/12/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 10/17/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/17/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/18/1989
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/18/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/23/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/23/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/25/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/31/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/31/1989
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/01/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 11/07/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/07/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/07/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/07/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 11/07/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/07/1989
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 11/15/1989
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/15/1989
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 11/20/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/18/1990