Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/16/1989
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 10/16/1989
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/18/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/18/1989
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 10/18/1989
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/18/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/18/1989
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 10/18/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/23/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/23/1989
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/23/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/24/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 10/24/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/24/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/25/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/25/1989
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 10/26/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2] 10/26/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/26/1989
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 10/26/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/26/1989
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/31/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/31/1989
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/31/1989
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 11/01/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/01/1989
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 11/01/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/01/1989
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 11/01/1989
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/01/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 11/01/1989
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/01/1989
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 11/01/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/01/1989
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/09/1989
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 11/09/1989
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 11/09/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/09/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/09/1989
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 11/09/1989
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 11/09/1989
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 11/14/1989
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 11/14/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/14/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 11/14/1989
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/14/1989
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/14/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/14/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 11/14/1989
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 11/14/1989
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 11/14/1989
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 11/15/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 11/15/1989
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/16/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 11/17/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/17/1989
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 11/17/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/17/1989
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 11/17/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/23/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 01/23/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/23/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/23/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 01/23/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/23/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 01/23/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 01/23/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/23/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/23/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/30/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 01/31/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/26/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 02/26/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/05/1990
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/08/1990
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/08/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/08/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/15/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/20/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/26/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/18/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/18/1990