Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 10/19/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/31/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/31/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/31/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/20/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/20/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 11/20/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 11/20/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 11/20/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 11/20/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/1989
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/20/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/20/1989
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 11/21/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/21/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 11/21/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/21/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/24/1990
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/24/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/24/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/24/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1990
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/24/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/24/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/25/1990