There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Aviation Act of 1958 to limit the age restrictions imposed upon aircraft pilots.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/19/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/02/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
11/02/1989Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
10/19/1989Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/19/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4]* 10/19/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 11/09/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/09/1989
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/23/1990
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 01/23/1990
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/23/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/23/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 01/23/1990
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 02/20/1990
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 02/20/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/20/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/20/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/20/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/20/1990
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/06/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/06/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/06/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 03/06/1990
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/06/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 03/14/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/14/1990
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/21/1990
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 03/21/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 03/21/1990
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/21/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 03/21/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/18/1990
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/18/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/05/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/20/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/20/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/20/1990
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/20/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/20/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/31/1990
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 10/19/1989 05/03/1990 --
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/20/1990 06/07/1990 --
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/14/1990 07/13/1990 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation10/19/1989 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation11/02/1989 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3498. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/19/1989)

Amends the Federal Aviation Act of 1958 to prohibit the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration from refusing to issue or renew an airman's certificate, or terminate the employment of an airman, solely by reason of the airman's age if such person is under the age of 65.