Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 11/13/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2]* 11/13/1989
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 11/13/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 11/13/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/13/1989
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/21/1989
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/29/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 01/29/1990
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 01/29/1990
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/06/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/06/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 02/06/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/06/1990
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/06/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/06/1990
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/06/1990
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/06/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/06/1990
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/07/1990
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/20/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/20/1990
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/20/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/20/1990
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 02/20/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/27/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/27/1990
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/27/1990
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/27/1990
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/28/1990
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 02/28/1990
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/1990
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/06/1990
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/06/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/06/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/06/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/07/1990
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/19/1990
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/19/1990
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/19/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/19/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/19/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/19/1990
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 03/19/1990
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 03/19/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/27/1990
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/27/1990
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 03/27/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/04/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 04/18/1990
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/18/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 04/24/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/24/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/08/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/10/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/15/1990
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/22/1990
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/06/1990
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/27/1990
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/12/1990
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 07/12/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/19/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 07/23/1990
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 08/01/1990
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/10/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/18/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/18/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 09/25/1990