Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Douglas, Chuck [R-NH-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/21/1989
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/21/1989
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/21/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 11/21/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 11/21/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 01/24/1990
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/24/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 01/24/1990
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 01/24/1990
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/24/1990
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/24/1990
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 01/24/1990
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 01/24/1990
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 01/24/1990
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/24/1990
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/24/1990
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/24/1990
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/24/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/24/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 01/24/1990
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/24/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 01/24/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 01/24/1990
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 01/24/1990
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/24/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/05/1990
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/05/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/05/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/05/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/05/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/05/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/05/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/26/1990
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 02/26/1990
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 02/26/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/26/1990
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/26/1990
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 02/26/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/26/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/26/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/26/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/26/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/26/1990
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/26/1990
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/27/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/27/1990
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/27/1990
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 03/27/1990
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/27/1990
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/27/1990
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/27/1990
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 03/27/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/27/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/27/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/27/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/27/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/27/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/27/1990
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/27/1990
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/27/1990
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 03/27/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 06/20/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/20/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/20/1990