There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom of Choice Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the reproductive rights of women.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/17/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/04/1990Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
10/04/1990Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
10/03/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
10/02/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
11/21/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/17/1989Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/17/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 11/17/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/17/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/17/1989
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/21/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/21/1989
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 11/21/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/21/1989
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 11/21/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/21/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 11/21/1989
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 02/21/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/21/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 02/21/1990
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/21/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/21/1990
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Smith, Peter [R-VT-At Large] 02/21/1990
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/24/1990
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/24/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/24/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/1990
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/17/1990
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/17/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 09/17/1990
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/17/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/17/1990
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/17/1990
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/17/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/17/1990
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/17/1990

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/17/1989 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights11/21/1989 Referred to
10/03/1990 Hearings by
10/04/1990 Markup by
10/04/1990 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3700. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/1989)

Freedom of Choice Act of 1989 - Provides that a State may not restrict the right of a woman to choose to terminate a pregnancy: (1) before fetal viability; or (2) at any time, if such termination is necessary to protect the life or health of the woman. Allows a State to impose requirements medically necessary to protect the life or health of such women.