Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/20/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/30/1990
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 01/30/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/30/1990
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 01/30/1990
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/26/1990
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/26/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/26/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/26/1990
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/26/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 02/26/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/26/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/1990
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/12/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 03/12/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/12/1990
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/12/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/12/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 03/12/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/12/1990
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/12/1990
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/12/1990
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 03/12/1990
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/12/1990
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2] 03/12/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/18/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/18/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/18/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/18/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/18/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/18/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/18/1990
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/18/1990
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/18/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/10/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/10/1990
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/10/1990
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/10/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/13/1990
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/13/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 09/27/1990
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/27/1990
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/27/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/27/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/27/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew