There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Forest Hunter Safety and Protection Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture or other appropriate official to protect persons engaged in a lawful hunt within a National Forest or on other lands affected with a Federal interest; establishing an administrative civil remedy against individuals or groups intentionally obstructing, impeding, or interfering with the conduct of a lawful hunt; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/20/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
03/26/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
03/26/1990Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior, DOD.
03/14/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
01/05/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
11/21/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
11/21/1989Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
11/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 11/20/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/21/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/19/1990
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/26/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/02/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 05/15/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/16/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/06/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/07/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 10/16/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/18/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/23/1990

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture11/20/1989 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy11/21/1989 Referred to
03/14/1990 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs11/20/1989 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands01/05/1990 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries11/20/1989 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment03/26/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3768. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/1989)

National Forest Hunter Safety and Protection Act of 1989 - Prescribes civil penalties for knowingly interfering with the conduct of a lawful hunt in a national forest or on lands affected with a Federal interest. Authorizes injunctive relief, the recovery of actual and punitive damages, and the awarding of attorney's fees. Grants hunting and sportsman's organizations standing under this Act.