Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Grant, Bill [R-FL-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 11/20/1989
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 02/07/1990
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/21/1990
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/19/1990
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/26/1990
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/02/1990
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 05/15/1990
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/16/1990
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/06/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 06/07/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 08/01/1990
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 10/16/1990
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/18/1990
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/23/1990