There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Airport Capacity Expansion Financing Act of 1989

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Airport and Airway Improvement Act of 1982 to establish a program for guaranteeing the repayment of principal and interest on loans, bonds, and other securities issued to finance projects to expand the capacity of airports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/20/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/08/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation
02/06/1990Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation
12/06/1989Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, DOT, OMB.
12/04/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
11/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/1989Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/20/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation11/20/1989 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation12/04/1989 Referred to
02/08/1990 Hearings by
House Ways and Means11/20/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3779.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3779. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/20/1989)

Airport Capacity Expansion Financing Act of 1989 - Title I: Airport Capacity Expansion - Amends the Airport and Airway Improvement Act of 1982 to authorize the Secretary of Transportation to guarantee loans, bonds, and other securities issued by public agencies to finance airport expansion projects. Authorizes the Secretary to charge such agencies a fee for the analysis of security arrangements proposed by them.

Directs the Secretary to establish an advisory committee with respect to the implementation of this Act. Limits the amount of loans, bonds, or securities that may be guaranteed to no more than $6,000,000,000.

Title II: Guaranteed Securities Exempt From Restriction on Tax Exemption for Federally Guaranteed Bonds - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude bonds guaranteed under this Act from the restriction on tax exemption for federally guaranteed bonds (thus making the interest on such bonds tax-exempt).