Committees: H.R.3789 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs11/20/1989 Referred to
06/13/1990 Markup by
07/10/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-583 Part 1
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development12/15/1989 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce11/20/1989 Referred to
06/27/1990 Markup by
07/30/1990 Reported by H.Rept 101-583 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment12/11/1989 Referred to
06/15/1990 Hearings by
06/20/1990 Markup by
06/20/1990 Reported by
House Education and Labor11/20/1989 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education01/29/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities01/29/1990 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources01/29/1990 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs11/20/1989 Referred to