Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/20/1989
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/20/1989
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/22/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/22/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/22/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/22/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 02/22/1990
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/14/1990
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 03/14/1990
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/14/1990
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 03/14/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 03/14/1990
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/14/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/14/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/22/1990
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 03/22/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/22/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/22/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/22/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/22/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/22/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/22/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/22/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/22/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/29/1990
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/29/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/29/1990
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/18/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/18/1990
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 04/18/1990
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/18/1990
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/15/1990
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/15/1990
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/13/1990