There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Export Development Task Force Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a bipartisan task force on export development, and for other purpose.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/21/1989Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/01/1989Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade, and Monetary Policy.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
11/21/1989Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/1989Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/1989Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 11/21/1989
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/14/1990
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/14/1990
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/14/1990
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/14/1990
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 03/14/1990
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 03/14/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/14/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 03/14/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/14/1990
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/14/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/14/1990
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/14/1990
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/14/1990
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/14/1990
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 04/04/1990
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/04/1990
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/04/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/04/1990
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/04/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [R-AR-2] 04/04/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/04/1990
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/04/1990
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/04/1990
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/04/1990
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/04/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/04/1990
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/04/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/19/1990
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/19/1990
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/19/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/19/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/1990
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/19/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/17/1990
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/17/1990
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/17/1990
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/17/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/1990
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/17/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/14/1990
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/14/1990
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/25/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/21/1989 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs11/21/1989 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy12/01/1989 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3836.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3836. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/21/1989)

Export Development Task Force Act of 1990 - Establishes the Bipartisan Task Force on Export Development and Promotion to review all Federal activities and programs that assist U.S. businesses in export development or promotion of nonagricultural goods and services, including financing programs.

Establishes the Interagency Working Group on Export Development to develop export markets for U.S. nonagricultural goods and services.