There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rose Kushner Medicare Screening Mammography Act of 1990

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for coverage of annual screening mammography under part B of the medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/1990Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
11/05/1990See H.R.5835.
02/12/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/25/1990Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/23/1990Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/1990Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/23/1990Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 02/21/1990
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/21/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/21/1990
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/21/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/21/1990
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/21/1990
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/21/1990
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 02/21/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/21/1990
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/21/1990
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/21/1990
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/21/1990
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/21/1990
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/21/1990
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/21/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/21/1990
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/21/1990
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/21/1990
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/21/1990
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/21/1990
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/21/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 03/06/1990
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/06/1990
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/06/1990
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/20/1990
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/03/1990
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/1990
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/02/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/11/1990
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/12/1990
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/12/1990
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/12/1990
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/19/1990
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/19/1990
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/19/1990
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1990
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/19/1990
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/19/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/21/1990
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/26/1990
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/11/1990
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/11/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/1990
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1990
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/27/1990
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/27/1990
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/01/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/19/1990

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/23/1990 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/25/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/23/1990 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/12/1990 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/23/1990)

Rose Kushner Medicare Screening Mammography Act of 1990 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to cover screening mammographies for women over age 34 at a frequency which varies on the basis of a woman's age and risk of developing breast cancer. Finances such coverage by increasing the Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) premium.